Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Bay-Smidt | 01.10.2009 | 12.07.2010 | direktion |
Vagn Jørgen Simonsen | 01.06.1999 | 30.09.2009 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Bay-Smidt | 01.10.2009 | 12.07.2010 | bestyrelse |
Lars-Bo Andersen | 01.10.2009 | 12.07.2010 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Karup Jørgensen | 01.10.2009 | 12.07.2010 | formand |