Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bente Starcke | 01.10.1999 | 05.03.2003 | direktion |
Jørgen Henrik Christensen | 20.01.1999 | 01.10.1999 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mogens Starcke | 30.09.2000 | 05.03.2003 | bestyrelse |
Bente Starcke | 01.10.1999 | 05.03.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jens Erik Christensen | 01.10.1999 | 30.09.2000 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Starcke | 01.10.1999 | 19.04.2000 | bestyrelse |
Mikael Thomsen | 01.10.1999 | 19.04.2000 | bestyrelse |
Lilian Gørrild Slot | 20.01.1999 | 05.03.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Henrik Christensen | 20.01.1999 | 01.10.1999 | bestyrelse |
Lars Ring | 20.01.1999 | 01.10.1999 | bestyrelse |
Anders Næsby | 20.01.1999 | 01.10.1999 | bestyrelse |