Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Fjeldal Jensen | 15.03.2001 | 26.11.2001 | direktion |
Peter Bøgelund | 23.02.2001 | 23.03.2001 | direktion |
Jens Fjeldal | 31.03.1999 | 23.02.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Fjeldal | 15.03.2001 | 06.10.2003 | bestyrelse |
Peter Steen Friis-Poulsen | 15.03.2001 | 06.10.2003 | bestyrelse |
Peter Fjeldal Jensen | 15.03.2001 | 26.11.2001 | bestyrelse |
Michael Anton Dines Zedeler | 23.02.2001 | 23.03.2001 | bestyrelse |
Peter Bøgelund | 23.02.2001 | 23.03.2001 | bestyrelse |
Niels Ebbe Valdal | 23.02.2001 | 23.03.2001 | formand |
Christian Dovland | 11.07.2000 | 26.02.2001 | bestyrelse |
Tomas Holmström | 11.07.2000 | 26.02.2001 | formand |
Thomas Camp Sørensen | 01.05.1999 | 31.01.2000 | bestyrelse |
Peter Steen Friis-Poulsen | 31.03.1999 | 23.02.2001 | bestyrelse |
Jens Fjeldal | 31.03.1999 | 11.07.2000 | bestyrelse |
Michael Anton Dines Zedeler | 31.03.1999 | 17.06.1996 | formand |