Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bjørn Svendsen | 30.06.2021 | 24.10.2023 | adm. dir |
Bente Margrethe Svendsen | 13.01.2014 | 30.06.2021 | adm. dir |
Kim Degel Svendsen | 26.03.2012 | 13.01.2014 | adm. dir |
Bjørn Svendsen | 15.07.1999 | 26.03.2012 | direktør |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 01.04.1999 | 15.07.1999 | direktør |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kim Degel Svendsen | 16.12.2020 | 30.06.2021 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Bjørn Svendsen | 02.01.2015 | 30.06.2021 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Klaus Bo Rasmussen | 02.01.2015 | 31.05.2017 | formand |
Flemming Hviid | 13.01.2014 | 31.12.2014 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Bente Margrethe Svendsen | 26.03.2012 | 30.06.2021 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Kim Degel Svendsen | 15.07.1999 | 13.01.2014 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 01.04.1999 | 15.07.1999 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Annemette Heller | 01.04.1999 | 15.07.1999 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Kim Madsen | 01.04.1999 | 15.07.1999 | formand |