Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Finn Vestergaard | 27.02.2004 | 21.06.2005 | direktion |
Anders Ravn | 01.04.1999 | 27.02.2004 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Lorensen | 28.02.2001 | 21.06.2005 | bestyrelse |
Svend Leo Munck Olsen | 28.02.2001 | 30.04.2003 | bestyrelse |
Holger Hinz | 26.10.2000 | 28.02.2001 | formand |
Finn Vestergaard | 01.04.1999 | 21.06.2005 | bestyrelse |
Nicolai Edinger | 01.04.1999 | 21.06.2005 | formand |
Eskild Lyngholm | 01.04.1999 | 26.10.2000 | bestyrelse |