Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kristian Thomsen | 11.06.1999 | 18.09.2017 | direktion |
Kim Madsen | 01.01.1999 | 11.06.1999 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kristian Thomsen | 21.02.2006 | 18.09.2017 | bestyrelse |
Lone Thomsen | 21.02.2006 | 18.09.2017 | bestyrelse |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 01.01.1999 | 11.06.1999 | bestyrelse |