Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Sten Erik Gretved | 11.05.1999 | 02.03.2005 | direktion |
Frank Ravnild | 11.05.1999 | 31.03.2002 | direktion |
Kim Madsen | 01.01.1999 | 11.05.1999 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Sten Erik Gretved | 11.05.1999 | 02.03.2005 | bestyrelse |
Birgit Modvig Gretved Hesselberg | 11.05.1999 | 31.03.2002 | bestyrelse |
Jens Gjerrild Hviid | 11.05.1999 | 31.03.2002 | bestyrelse |
Heidi Adly Ravnild | 11.05.1999 | 31.03.2002 | formand |
Frank Ravnild | 11.05.1999 | 15.02.2002 | bestyrelse |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 01.01.1999 | 11.05.1999 | bestyrelse |