Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Bang | 01.10.1998 | 19.10.2009 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lise-Lotte Haugaard Bang | 20.05.2003 | 19.10.2009 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Bang | 01.10.1998 | 19.10.2009 | bestyrelse |
Svend Aage Helsinghoff | 01.10.1998 | 17.08.2009 | bestyrelse |
Charlotte Bang | 01.10.1998 | 20.08.2001 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Peter Bang | 01.10.1998 | 01.10.2000 | bestyrelse |