Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Winkel-Pedersen | 26.02.1996 | 29.06.1998 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Winkel-Pedersen | 26.02.1996 | 29.06.1998 | bestyrelse |
Michael David Prince | 26.02.1996 | 29.06.1998 | bestyrelse |
John Nielsen Ottesen | 26.02.1996 | 29.06.1998 | bestyrelse |
Erling Vangedal-Nielsen | 26.02.1996 | 05.03.1997 | bestyrelse |
Michel Fanini | 26.02.1996 | 15.01.1997 | bestyrelse |