Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Finn Knud Mortensen | 20.05.1999 | 30.03.2023 | direktør |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.02.1999 | 20.05.1999 | direktør |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Christian Hansen | 28.03.2022 | 30.03.2023 | formand |
Marianne Mortensen | 01.10.2007 | 30.03.2023 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Finn Knud Mortensen | 20.05.1999 | 30.03.2023 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Michael Antitsch Mortensen | 20.05.1999 | 31.01.2022 | formand |
Else Marie Mortensen | 20.05.1999 | 01.10.2007 | bestyrelsesmedlem |