Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kjeld Hansen | 24.03.2003 | 11.10.2004 | formand |
Kristian Emil Rahbek | 15.03.1999 | 11.10.2004 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Munk Pedersen | 15.03.1999 | 11.10.2004 | bestyrelse |
Michael Kaa Andersen | 09.11.1998 | 15.03.1999 | bestyrelse |
Hanne Wedell-Neergaard | 09.11.1998 | 15.03.1999 | bestyrelse |
Kurt Kim Petersen | 09.11.1998 | 15.03.1999 | bestyrelse |