Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Vigdis Haukaas | 01.11.2000 | 09.08.2001 | direktion |
Mats Westerborn | 12.03.2000 | 15.02.2000 | direktion |
Monica Prats Castillo | 15.02.2000 | 01.11.2000 | direktion |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 01.01.1999 | 18.10.1999 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Victoria Edlund | 01.11.2000 | 19.03.2001 | bestyrelse |
Eva Kristina Lindhardt | 12.03.2000 | 04.04.2001 | bestyrelse |
Mats Westerborn | 12.03.2000 | 04.04.2001 | formand |
Camilla Westerborn | 18.10.1999 | 12.03.2000 | bestyrelse |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 01.01.1999 | 18.10.1999 | bestyrelse |
Annemette Heller | 01.01.1999 | 18.10.1999 | bestyrelse |
Kim Madsen | 01.01.1999 | 18.10.1999 | formand |