Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Elmar Groth | 07.09.2016 | 17.05.2017 | direktør |
Elmar Groth | 03.11.1998 | 18.05.2016 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Inaluk Agathe Lennert Groth | 03.11.1998 | 18.05.2016 | bestyrelse |
Elmar Groth | 03.11.1998 | 18.05.2016 | bestyrelse |
Ane Margrethe Groth | 03.11.1998 | 18.05.2016 | formand |