Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Rene Arnfeldt Møller | 03.10.2001 | 02.11.2004 | adm. dir |
Henrik Lykke Hansen | 01.11.1998 | 03.10.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thorkil Svindt | 03.08.2001 | 02.11.2004 | bestyrelse |
Jan Borregaard-Otzen | 03.08.2001 | 02.11.2004 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Steenholt | 01.11.1998 | 02.11.2004 | bestyrelse |
Rene Arnfeldt Møller | 01.11.1998 | 02.11.2004 | bestyrelse |
Kield-Gustav Erichsen | 01.11.1998 | 03.08.2001 | formand |