Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gert Hauge | 26.06.1998 | 09.11.2010 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Klaus Kejlberg Schulze | 21.06.2002 | 09.11.2010 | bestyrelse |
Gert Hauge | 26.06.1998 | 09.11.2010 | bestyrelse |
Winnie Gadegaard Hauge | 26.06.1998 | 09.11.2010 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Meyer Petersen | 26.06.1998 | 30.05.2005 | bestyrelse |