Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Milvertz | 06.03.2008 | 14.01.2009 | direktion |
Tonny Rasmussen | 17.08.2007 | 06.03.2008 | direktion |
Erling Jensen | 11.09.2002 | 14.01.2009 | direktion |
Carlo Wang Fung Chow | 11.09.2002 | 17.08.2007 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bo Bramsen | 14.03.2008 | 14.01.2009 | formand |
Michael Vinther | 06.03.2008 | 14.01.2009 | bestyrelse |
Jan Milvertz | 06.03.2008 | 14.01.2009 | bestyrelse |
Per Søndergaard Pedersen | 06.03.2008 | 14.01.2009 | bestyrelse |
Karen Frøsig | 08.02.2008 | 06.03.2008 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Rundin Sandbæk | 08.02.2008 | 06.03.2008 | formand |
Tonny Rasmussen | 17.08.2007 | 06.03.2008 | bestyrelse |
Jens Lundgård Nielsen | 30.03.2001 | 08.02.2008 | bestyrelse |
Steen Bach Nielsen | 01.03.2000 | 30.03.2001 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Robert Holm | 28.10.1998 | 08.02.2008 | bestyrelse |
Carlo Wang Fung Chow | 28.10.1998 | 17.08.2007 | bestyrelse |
Erik Vilhelm Asmund | 28.10.1998 | 01.03.2000 | bestyrelse |