Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Flemming Christensen | 10.06.2002 | 12.11.2004 | bestyrelse |
Birthe Ørsnes Larsen | 10.06.2002 | 12.11.2004 | bestyrelse |
Peter Larsen | 22.08.2001 | 12.11.2004 | bestyrelse |
Birthe Ørsnes Larsen | 22.08.2001 | 10.06.2002 | bestyrelse |
Georg Nico Vilsen | 28.08.1998 | 12.11.2004 | bestyrelse |