Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Pedersen | 04.01.2001 | 20.08.2007 | direktion |
Uffe Bruhn Hansen | 30.06.1999 | 04.01.2001 | direktion |
Arne Krogh | 28.12.1998 | 30.06.1999 | direktion |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.09.1998 | 06.04.1999 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Uffe Bruhn Hansen | 28.12.1998 | 20.08.2007 | bestyrelse |
Allan Bransholm Sand | 28.12.1998 | 20.08.2007 | bestyrelse |
Kent Bransholm Sand | 28.12.1998 | 20.08.2007 | formand |
Arne Krogh | 28.12.1998 | 30.06.1999 | bestyrelse |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.09.1998 | 06.04.1999 | bestyrelse |
Lone Mai Henriksen | 01.09.1998 | 06.04.1999 | bestyrelse |
Stephan Muurholm | 01.09.1998 | 06.04.1999 | formand |