Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
lars Åke Marcusson | 15.03.2000 | 13.09.2000 | direktion |
Jørgen Holst Albrechtsen | 18.09.1998 | 15.03.2000 | direktion |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 01.05.1998 | 18.09.1998 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mulford Jackson Nobbs | 15.03.2000 | 12.12.2000 | bestyrelse |
Jeffrey Mulford Nobbs | 15.03.2000 | 12.12.2000 | bestyrelse |
Kjeld Kornum | 18.09.1998 | 18.09.2000 | bestyrelse |
Pernille Nanny Albrechtsen | 18.09.1998 | 15.03.2000 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Holst Albrechtsen | 18.09.1998 | 15.03.2000 | bestyrelse |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 01.05.1998 | 18.09.1998 | bestyrelse |
Annemette Heller | 01.05.1998 | 18.09.1998 | bestyrelse |
Kim Madsen | 01.05.1998 | 18.09.1998 | formand |