Bestyrelse | Dato | Rolle |
---|---|---|
Peder Skov | 20.12.2011 | bestyrelse |
John Holflod Jeppesen | 20.12.2011 | formand |
Michael Hartmann Anthony | 12.12.2003 | bestyrelse |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kim Hansen | 19.10.2015 | 25.09.2018 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Jørgen Martinussen | 20.12.2011 | 21.12.2011 | bestyrelse |
Jann Antony Jensen | 12.12.2003 | 21.12.2011 | bestyrelse |