Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Olsen | 01.01.1999 | 21.06.2012 | adm. dir |
Knud Ove Engelsholm | 22.06.1998 | 01.01.1999 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Olsen | 22.06.1998 | 03.12.2012 | bestyrelse |
Knud Ove Engelsholm | 22.06.1998 | 03.12.2012 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Christian Haldbo | 22.06.1998 | 17.05.2011 | bestyrelse |