Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Juul-Hansen | 15.05.1998 | 30.10.2003 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Finn Helmer | 01.10.2000 | 30.10.2003 | formand |
Jens Juul-Hansen | 15.05.1998 | 30.10.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jan Sjöberg | 15.05.1998 | 30.10.2003 | formand |
Rein Ytterberg | 15.05.1998 | 07.08.2003 | bestyrelse |