Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Helt | 13.08.2007 | 22.06.2010 | direktion |
Tom Matthiesen | 12.03.1998 | 13.08.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Rolf Lavigne Ussing | 02.01.2008 | 22.06.2010 | bestyrelse |
Steen Gude | 02.01.2008 | 22.06.2010 | formand |
Michael Axelsen | 13.08.2007 | 22.06.2010 | bestyrelse |
Tom Matthiesen | 13.08.2007 | 02.01.2008 | formand |
Susanne Munk Matthiesen | 01.05.2006 | 13.08.2007 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Leonard Abel | 01.05.2006 | 13.08.2007 | formand |