Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hiroko Holst | 22.10.1998 | 25.04.2001 | direktion |
Kurt Schønemann-Paul | 25.07.1998 | 22.10.1998 | direktion |
Kazuhiro Furukawa | 17.06.1998 | 25.07.1998 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Daisuke Uki | 17.06.1998 | 22.10.1998 | bestyrelse |
Hiroko Holst | 17.06.1998 | 22.10.1998 | bestyrelse |
Kurt Schønemann-Paul | 17.06.1998 | 22.10.1998 | bestyrelse |
Kazuhiro Furukawa | 17.06.1998 | 25.07.1998 | bestyrelse |