Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Rasmus Michael Jensen | 27.06.2000 | 24.06.2008 | direktion |
Ole Stouby | 27.06.2000 | 24.06.2008 | adm. dir |
Ole Ejsing Kirchert Christensen | 27.06.2000 | 16.05.2001 | direktion |
John Jensen | 27.06.2000 | 04.05.2001 | direktion |
Odd Lyder Johnsen | 27.06.2000 | 01.08.2000 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Ceutz | 13.03.2001 | 26.04.2001 | formand |
Kjeld Ostenfeldt Mathiesen | 07.02.2001 | 05.03.2001 | bestyrelse |
Ole Stouby | 27.06.2000 | 24.06.2008 | bestyrelse |
Anette Føns | 27.06.2000 | 20.04.2001 | bestyrelse |
Peer Bjørck | 27.06.2000 | 07.02.2001 | bestyrelse |