Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Allan Johnsen | 12.02.2010 | 18.12.2017 | direktion |
Albert Georg Johnsen | 29.06.1998 | 12.02.2010 | direktion |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 01.01.1998 | 29.06.1998 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Betina Susanne Andersen | 18.05.2011 | 18.12.2017 | bestyrelse |
Marianne Johnsen | 18.05.2011 | 18.12.2017 | formand |
Albert Georg Johnsen | 12.02.2010 | 18.05.2011 | formand |
Allan Johnsen | 01.10.2002 | 18.12.2017 | bestyrelse |
Steen Hommelhoff Jensen | 01.10.2002 | 13.10.2009 | bestyrelse |