Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kurt Holm Nielsen | 01.03.1995 | 18.08.2000 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.03.1995 | 05.10.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kurt Holm Nielsen | 01.03.1995 | 18.08.2000 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Eberhardt Berg | 01.03.1995 | 18.08.2000 | bestyrelse |
Ole Nielsen | 01.03.1995 | 25.02.1998 | bestyrelse |
John Jørgensen | 01.03.1995 | 25.02.1998 | bestyrelse |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.03.1995 | 05.10.1995 | bestyrelse |
Sebastian Benjamin Bahn Christoffersen | 01.03.1995 | 05.10.1995 | bestyrelse |
Helen Mimi Janniche | 01.03.1995 | 05.10.1995 | bestyrelse |