Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Tonny Facius Lauridsen | 28.03.2001 | 05.09.2015 | direktion |
Poul Schwartz Madsen | 08.04.1998 | 31.01.2001 | direktion |
Preben Klement Andersen | 31.03.1998 | 08.04.1998 | direktion |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.01.1998 | 31.03.1998 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Flemming Johannesen | 02.09.2014 | 05.09.2015 | bestyrelse |
Anders Torbensen | 02.09.2014 | 05.09.2015 | bestyrelse |
Michael Henrik Thomsen | 02.09.2014 | 05.09.2015 | bestyrelse |
Neal White | 02.09.2014 | 05.09.2015 | bestyrelse |
Nis Christian Phillipsen | 02.09.2014 | 05.09.2015 | formand |
Ove Børge Dalum | 22.10.2009 | 03.10.2011 | bestyrelse |
William Anthony Pecora | 28.05.2008 | 02.09.2014 | bestyrelse |
Serigo Ranieri | 28.03.2003 | 28.05.2008 | bestyrelse |
Tonny Facius Lauridsen | 31.05.2001 | 05.09.2015 | bestyrelse |
Don Louis Canterna | 31.05.2001 | 28.03.2003 | bestyrelse |
William Charles Griffiths | 01.03.1999 | 28.03.2003 | formand |
James M Gibbs | 01.03.1999 | 31.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Poul Schwartz Madsen | 01.03.1999 | 31.01.2001 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Vangsgaard Hansen | 31.03.1998 | 28.03.2003 | bestyrelse |
Robert Edward Drury | 31.03.1998 | 01.03.1999 | bestyrelse |
John Gordon MacKay | 31.03.1998 | 01.03.1999 | formand |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.01.1998 | 31.03.1998 | bestyrelse |
Lone Mai Henriksen | 01.01.1998 | 31.03.1998 | bestyrelse |
Stephan Muurholm | 01.01.1998 | 31.03.1998 | formand |