Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Riggelsen | 26.04.2000 | 31.12.2003 | direktion |
Hardy Nielsen | 30.11.1999 | 26.04.2000 | direktion |
Peter Riggelsen | 30.11.1999 | 30.11.1999 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Friis | 12.06.2002 | 31.12.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Andersen | 16.05.2002 | 31.12.2003 | formand |
Peter Riggelsen | 26.04.2000 | 31.12.2003 | bestyrelse |
Peter Dahl | 26.04.2000 | 12.06.2002 | bestyrelse |
Peter Riggelsen | 23.12.1997 | 16.05.2002 | bestyrelse |