Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan-Erik Gaba | 12.03.2012 | 28.10.2016 | bestyrelse |
Niels Henrik Holm Jensen | 07.02.2007 | 28.10.2016 | bestyrelse |
John Munk Pedersen | 08.02.2006 | 28.10.2016 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Larsen | 08.02.2006 | 12.03.2012 | formand |
Peter Frederiksen | 08.02.2006 | 07.02.2007 | bestyrelse |