Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørn Frederiksen | 19.03.1998 | 23.03.1999 | direktion |
Carl-Valdemar Buchwald | 31.10.1997 | 22.05.2006 | direktion |
Henrik Calum | 31.10.1997 | 19.03.1998 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Ole Okholm | 15.04.2003 | 22.05.2006 | bestyrelse |
Erik Otto Permin | 19.03.1998 | 22.05.2006 | bestyrelse |
Carl-Valdemar Buchwald | 19.03.1998 | 22.05.2006 | formand |
Jørn Frederiksen | 19.03.1998 | 15.04.2003 | bestyrelse |