Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Joseph Hester | 06.08.1998 | 06.06.2000 | direktion |
Erik Mench Klavsen | 23.07.1998 | 19.09.2012 | direktion |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 15.09.1997 | 23.07.1998 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 15.09.1997 | 19.03.1998 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Joan Rodahl Thisted | 22.11.2001 | 20.01.2010 | bestyrelse |
Niels Kamp Thulstrup | 22.11.2001 | 20.01.2010 | formand |
Erik Mench Klavsen | 06.06.2000 | 19.09.2012 | bestyrelse |
Thaddeus Edward Grzywacz | 06.08.1998 | 22.11.2001 | bestyrelse |
Stephen Thomas Isaf | 06.08.1998 | 06.06.2000 | bestyrelse |