Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
June Mejlgaard Jensen | 01.03.2007 | 28.05.2013 | direktion |
Lars Roslyng | 20.06.2002 | 01.03.2007 | direktion |
Peter Lauring | 10.03.1999 | 31.05.2002 | direktion |
Kim Kristoffersen | 26.03.1998 | 10.03.1999 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.09.1997 | 06.04.1998 | direktion |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 01.09.1997 | 26.03.1998 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jesper Balsby | 21.09.2012 | 28.05.2013 | bestyrelse |
Øystein Moan | 21.09.2012 | 28.05.2013 | formand |
June Mejlgaard Jensen | 10.04.2007 | 28.05.2013 | bestyrelse |
Peter Lauring | 10.04.2007 | 21.09.2012 | formand |
Klaus Jensen | 10.04.2007 | 27.02.2009 | bestyrelse |