Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mogens Niels Kokborg | 16.04.1998 | 21.06.2001 | direktion |
Kim Madsen | 01.09.1997 | 16.04.1998 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mogens Niels Kokborg | 16.04.1998 | 21.06.2001 | bestyrelse |
Charlotte Stitz | 16.04.1998 | 21.06.2001 | bestyrelse |
Kristina Kokborg | 16.04.1998 | 21.06.2001 | bestyrelse |
Lisbet Kløv Hansen | 16.04.1998 | 21.06.2001 | formand |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 01.09.1997 | 16.04.1998 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.09.1997 | 19.03.1998 | bestyrelse |