Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jannic Michael Rasmussen | 10.02.1999 | 23.08.2002 | direktion |
Frans Merrild | 22.01.1998 | 10.02.1999 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.07.1997 | 22.01.1998 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Tummas Johan Hansen | 29.08.2001 | 23.08.2002 | bestyrelse |
Lars Erik Clausen | 19.05.1999 | 23.08.2002 | bestyrelse |
Nicholas Martin Brooks | 19.05.1999 | 29.08.2001 | formand |
Michael Bjørn Jørgensen | 22.01.1998 | 23.08.2002 | næstformand |
Ole Brinch-Nielsen | 22.01.1998 | 19.05.1999 | formand |
Peter Tommerup | 22.01.1998 | 30.06.1998 | bestyrelse |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.07.1997 | 22.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Sebastian Benjamin Bahn Christoffersen | 01.07.1997 | 22.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Helen Mimi Janniche | 01.07.1997 | 22.01.1998 | bestyrelse |