Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Pia Friis Petersen | 08.09.1997 | 05.03.2003 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Austin Alexander George Hutchison | 24.09.2002 | 05.03.2003 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Groos | 24.09.2002 | 05.03.2003 | bestyrelse |
Pia Friis Petersen | 08.09.1997 | 05.03.2003 | formand |
Kenn Esmann Nielsen | 08.09.1997 | 01.12.2000 | bestyrelse |