Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steen Aalund Olsen | 15.01.2015 | 15.12.2015 | adm. dir |
Henrik Bo Lund | 01.02.1999 | 23.06.2000 | direktion |
Sven Grønlykke | 24.08.1997 | 01.02.1999 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Vildenfeldt | 15.01.2015 | 15.12.2015 | bestyrelse |
Steen Halbye | 15.01.2015 | 15.12.2015 | formand |
Mikael Grønlykke | 05.10.2012 | 15.01.2015 | bestyrelse |
Jacob Grønlykke | 05.10.2012 | 15.01.2015 | formand |
Jesper Uggerhøj | 08.10.2008 | 05.10.2012 | formand |
Jeppe Andreas Grønlykke | 28.02.2008 | 15.01.2015 | personlig_suppleant |
Björn Olof Sederblad | 28.02.2008 | 17.09.2012 | bestyrelse |
Ola Harald Erici | 28.02.2008 | 17.09.2012 | personlig_suppleant |
Mikael Grønlykke | 28.02.2008 | 18.03.2010 | bestyrelse |
Mats Henry Robert Bengtsson | 01.04.2004 | 28.02.2008 | bestyrelse |
Karen Sofie Hansen-Hoeck | 14.11.2002 | 22.10.2004 | bestyrelse |
Steen Aalund Olsen | 23.06.2000 | 15.12.2015 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Bo Lund | 01.02.1999 | 08.01.1999 | bestyrelse |
Maria Grønlykke | 08.01.1999 | 14.11.2002 | bestyrelse |
Jeppe Andreas Grønlykke | 24.08.1997 | 14.11.2002 | formand |
Sven Grønlykke | 24.08.1997 | 08.01.1999 | bestyrelse |