Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Wessmann Jensen | 08.02.2002 | 21.08.2009 | adm. dir |
Jan Bjerregaard Christensen | 07.05.2001 | 08.02.2002 | direktion |
Henrik Wessmann Jensen | 07.05.2001 | 07.05.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Wessmann Jensen | 08.02.2002 | 10.02.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jan Bjerregaard Christensen | 07.05.2001 | 08.02.2002 | bestyrelse |
Søren Refsgaard | 07.05.2001 | 22.10.2001 | bestyrelse |
Lars Heide Rasmussen | 15.12.2000 | 07.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Jacob Nyborg | 01.05.2000 | 10.02.2003 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Steglich-Petersen | 01.05.2000 | 15.12.2000 | bestyrelse |
Michael Holger Røssell | 01.07.1997 | 01.05.2000 | bestyrelse |
Claes Robert Magnus Ekbom | 01.07.1997 | 01.05.2000 | bestyrelse |