Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mogens Otte Jensen | 01.04.2004 | 25.09.2014 | adm. dir |
Ivan Frederiksen | 03.06.1997 | 01.04.2004 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Otte Jensen | 11.05.2011 | 25.09.2014 | formand |
Ivan Frederiksen | 02.07.2007 | 11.05.2011 | bestyrelse |
Ivan Høeg | 31.05.2006 | 11.05.2011 | formand |
Jan Allan Nielsen | 27.02.2004 | 31.05.2006 | formand |
Mogens Otte Jensen | 03.06.1997 | 25.09.2014 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Otte Jensen | 03.06.1997 | 25.09.2014 | bestyrelse |
Magnus Nesdam-Madsen | 03.06.1997 | 21.03.2003 | bestyrelse |
Edvard Jensen | 03.06.1997 | 02.03.1999 | bestyrelse |