Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Alexandre Stebaev | 10.04.2003 | 21.02.2006 | direktion |
Alexandre Stebaev | 10.03.1997 | 10.04.2003 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Alexandre Stebaev | 10.04.2003 | 21.02.2006 | bestyrelse |
Gregory Vulfson | 10.03.1997 | 21.02.2006 | bestyrelse |
Emma Stebaeva | 10.03.1997 | 21.02.2006 | bestyrelse |
Alexandre Stebaev | 10.03.1997 | 10.04.2003 | bestyrelse |
Vagn Rytter Jensen | 10.03.1997 | 22.04.1998 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Hinsch | 10.03.1997 | 22.04.1998 | bestyrelse |