Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Nielsen | 01.02.2001 | 03.07.2001 | adm. dir |
Peter Thor Munck Birkmand | 19.06.2000 | 20.06.2000 | direktion |
Martin Svanholm Borch | 10.10.1997 | 01.02.2001 | direktion |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.05.1997 | 10.10.1997 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Mahler | 26.10.2000 | 03.07.2001 | formand |
Gisli Thor Reynisson | 20.06.2000 | 26.10.2000 | bestyrelse |
Martin Svanholm Borch | 19.06.2000 | 03.07.2001 | bestyrelse |
Peter Thor Munck Birkmand | 19.06.2000 | 03.07.2001 | bestyrelse |