Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jesper Wilhelm Wieder | 11.11.1996 | 21.02.1997 | adm. dir |
Flemming Thomas Kirkegaard | 13.08.1996 | 11.11.1996 | direktion |
Henrik Møllgaard Bruun de Neergaard | 12.01.1996 | 22.03.1996 | direktion |
Nino Guiralarocca | 01.12.1995 | 12.01.1996 | adm. dir |
Marcus Reinholdt Pedersen | 01.12.1993 | 13.08.1996 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.12.1993 | 01.12.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Morten Falcon | 01.12.1995 | 22.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Michael Brink Frederiksen | 01.12.1995 | 22.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Michael Baron Stennicke | 01.12.1995 | 22.03.1996 | formand |
Jørgen Henning Frederiksen | 01.12.1995 | 12.01.1996 | bestyrelse |
Richard René Salm Wiede | 01.12.1993 | 21.02.1997 | bestyrelse |
Marcus Reinholdt Pedersen | 01.12.1993 | 21.02.1997 | bestyrelse |
Mads Winther Rademacher | 01.12.1993 | 21.02.1997 | bestyrelse |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.12.1993 | 01.12.1995 | bestyrelse |
Sebastian Benjamin Bahn Christoffersen | 01.12.1993 | 01.12.1995 | bestyrelse |
Helen Mimi Janniche | 01.12.1993 | 01.12.1995 | bestyrelse |