Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Anton Bundgaard | 03.10.1997 | 04.12.2000 | direktion |
Kirsten Annitta Norup Jensen | 23.09.1997 | 03.10.1997 | direktion |
Kim Madsen | 01.05.1997 | 23.09.1997 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Valdemar Christgau | 03.10.1997 | 04.12.2000 | bestyrelse |
Poul Anton Bundgaard | 03.10.1997 | 04.12.2000 | bestyrelse |
Jens Christian Lorenzen | 23.09.1997 | 04.12.2000 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1997 | 23.09.1997 | bestyrelse |