Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Bender | 15.10.2011 | 23.09.2013 | adm. dir |
Michael Anker Mark | 15.01.2009 | 15.10.2011 | direktion |
Jan Bender | 01.09.1997 | 15.01.2009 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.04.1997 | 03.09.1997 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Bender | 19.01.2009 | 23.09.2013 | formand |
Michael Anker Mark | 19.01.2009 | 15.10.2011 | bestyrelse |
Hanne Bender | 05.07.2001 | 25.02.2002 | bestyrelse |
Jan Bender | 01.09.1997 | 25.02.2002 | bestyrelse |
Karsten Christian Witt | 01.09.1997 | 25.02.2002 | formand |
Stig Hølledig | 01.09.1997 | 05.07.2001 | bestyrelse |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.04.1997 | 03.09.1997 | bestyrelse |
Sebastian Benjamin Bahn Christoffersen | 01.04.1997 | 03.09.1997 | bestyrelse |
Helen Mimi Janniche | 01.04.1997 | 03.09.1997 | bestyrelse |