Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
René Ravn | 02.10.1997 | 19.05.2014 | direktion |
René Ravn | 02.10.1997 | 31.12.2007 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 15.04.1997 | 02.10.1997 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
René Ravn | 16.01.2008 | 31.12.2011 | bestyrelse |
Lis Ravn | 16.01.2008 | 31.12.2011 | bestyrelse |
Erik Eilerskov Ravn | 16.01.2008 | 31.12.2011 | bestyrelse |