Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Dietrich | 17.12.1997 | 12.12.2003 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.05.1997 | 17.12.1997 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Toft Boesen | 20.06.2003 | 12.12.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Harder | 20.06.2003 | 12.12.2003 | bestyrelse |
Hans Kirk | 20.06.2003 | 12.12.2003 | formand |