Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steen Johnsen | 01.11.2000 | 31.10.2002 | direktion |
Svend Mortensen | 11.03.1998 | 01.11.2000 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.05.1997 | 11.03.1998 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steen Johnsen | 01.11.2000 | 31.10.2002 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Mortensen | 01.11.2000 | 31.10.2002 | bestyrelse |
Svend Mortensen | 01.11.2000 | 31.10.2002 | formand |