Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Torben Bech Christensen | 07.03.2003 | 18.01.2006 | direktion |
Uffe Lunding Berg | 09.07.2001 | 07.03.2003 | direktion |
Torben Bech Christensen | 02.06.1997 | 09.07.2001 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 15.12.1996 | 02.06.1997 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Johnny Røn | 07.03.2003 | 18.01.2006 | bestyrelse |
Torben Bech Christensen | 07.03.2003 | 18.01.2006 | bestyrelse |
Uffe Lunding Berg | 09.07.2001 | 07.03.2003 | bestyrelse |
Birger Heine Rasmussen | 09.07.2001 | 24.06.2002 | formand |
Birte Christensen | 11.05.2000 | 09.07.2001 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Bech Christensen | 02.06.1997 | 18.01.2006 | bestyrelse |
Torben Bech Christensen | 02.06.1997 | 09.07.2001 | bestyrelse |
Gorm Hagensen | 02.06.1997 | 11.05.2000 | bestyrelse |
Per Refsgaard Jensen | 02.06.1997 | 26.07.1999 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Galst | 15.12.1996 | 02.06.1997 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 15.12.1996 | 02.06.1997 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 15.12.1996 | 02.06.1997 | formand |