Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bjarne Kjærside | 15.07.2011 | 16.04.2012 | adm. dir |
Henning Jensen Fredsø | 31.12.2000 | 15.07.2011 | adm. dir |
Leo Hove | 26.06.1997 | 31.03.2000 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 15.12.1996 | 26.06.1997 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bjarne Kjærside | 15.07.2011 | 16.04.2012 | bestyrelse |
Else Margrethe Tingleff | 15.07.2011 | 16.04.2012 | bestyrelse |
Per-Anders Wilhelm Truedsson | 15.07.2011 | 16.04.2012 | formand |
Ole Rosgaard | 15.12.2008 | 15.07.2011 | formand |
Paul Stel | 04.11.2005 | 15.07.2011 | bestyrelse |
Pieter Johannes van Dommele | 12.04.2005 | 15.12.2008 | formand |
Søren Holm Pedersen | 12.04.2005 | 04.11.2005 | bestyrelse |
Thomas-Margar Tzifos | 12.04.2005 | 12.04.2005 | bestyrelse |
Reinder Zonderman | 27.08.2003 | 12.04.2005 | bestyrelse |
Henning Jensen Fredsø | 31.12.2000 | 15.07.2011 | bestyrelse |
Johannes Petrus Wortelboer | 31.12.2000 | 27.08.2003 | formand |
Marco Mels Verhelst | 31.03.2000 | 23.05.2002 | bestyrelse |
John Gert Martin van Esveld | 31.03.2000 | 31.12.2000 | bestyrelse |
Jan Alle Blaauw | 01.07.1999 | 31.12.2000 | formand |
Leo Hove | 26.06.1997 | 31.03.2000 | bestyrelse |
Frank Gerhard Jan Hoiting | 26.06.1997 | 31.03.2000 | bestyrelse |
Johannes René Faber | 26.06.1997 | 01.07.1999 | formand |
Hans Christian Galst | 15.12.1996 | 26.06.1997 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 15.12.1996 | 26.06.1997 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 15.12.1996 | 26.06.1997 | formand |