Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lisa Gunnarsson | 19.06.2000 | 26.10.2004 | direktion |
Petur Gudjon Gunnarsson | 01.10.1998 | 19.06.2000 | direktion |
Rune Faulenborg Skardhamar | 30.05.1997 | 01.10.1998 | direktion |
Petur Gudjon Gunnarsson | 05.05.1997 | 30.05.1997 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 15.12.1996 | 05.05.1997 | direktion |